What's new
  • This site uses cookies. By continuing to use this site, you are agreeing to our use of cookies. Learn more.
  • Do not use Chrome Incognito when registering as it freezes the registration page.
  • Guest, Join Papa Zoom today for some uplifting biblical encouragement! --> Daily Verses

Solve, if you are a genuis

Status
Not open for further replies.
Joined
Aug 4, 2005
Messages
4,461
Gender
Male
#7
I see where you're coming from, and how you got that, but I'm going to say 36.

(Think "area")

This is more of a teaser (unlike the problem he gave us using all 4's which is a straightforward calculation) and there's ways to interpret it. I'm assuming that the "X" between the numbers may be taken to mean multiplication. If, however, it means something else, then another solution is possible.

That said, don't expect Classik to ever give an answer but rather foster debates from everyone. I will show my work once others had a chance to give their input, then you will see I have a logical reason (and not a guess) why I stated what I did. And to give some tantalizing examples, I claim that
121 x 3 = 12
605 X 5 = 100 by extrapolating out the information given.
 
Joined
Nov 30, 2012
Messages
14,683
Christian
Yes
#8
I see where you're coming from, and how you got that, but I'm going to say 36.

(Think "area")

This is more of a teaser (unlike the problem he gave us using all 4's which is a straightforward calculation) and there's ways to interpret it. I'm assuming that the "X" between the numbers may be taken to mean multiplication. If, however, it means something else, then another solution is possible.

That said, don't expect Classik to ever give an answer but rather foster debates from everyone. I will show my work once others had a chance to give their input, then you will see I have a logical reason (and not a guess) why I stated what I did. And to give some tantalizing examples, I claim that
121 x 3 = 12
605 X 5 = 100 by extrapolating out the information given.
Using your logic I get 484 x 4 = 64
 
Joined
Nov 17, 2010
Messages
17,178
Christian
Yes
#10
I'm no good at math.

Not for the past 20 years, at any rate. I might have been better once, when my head was clearer.
 
Joined
Oct 16, 2012
Messages
4,637
Gender
Female
Christian
Yes
#14
I have no idea what "think area" means.... I've never done math in English. :-(
I just added + signs at a certain point and all equations were right, except your second one and deborah's.

Maybe I'm not as genius as you are. :sad
 
Joined
Oct 16, 2012
Messages
4,637
Gender
Female
Christian
Yes
#16
Take the product of the numbers and that both Classik and I gave, and divide by the "answer". What happens?
It's the same number for all of them. I tried to find out what is special about 30.25 but couldn't find anything.
.
 
Joined
Nov 30, 2012
Messages
14,683
Christian
Yes
#17
I have no idea what "think area" means.... I've never done math in English. :-(
I just added + signs at a certain point and all equations were right, except your second one and deborah's.

Maybe I'm not as genius as you are. :sad
I used all multiplication but division is just the inverse of multiplication.
 
Joined
Jul 12, 2012
Messages
718
Christian
Yes
#18
Yhea I figured out what you guys were doing but I don't get the significance of 30.25
 
Joined
Oct 16, 2012
Messages
4,637
Gender
Female
Christian
Yes
#19
Yhea I figured out what you guys were doing but I don't get the significance of 30.25
Neither do I. Maybe it's not so important that it's 30.25, but rather that it is a constant number...?

Anyway. My solution seems to be easier and works with Classik's original post. And the more uncomplicated solution is always the better one. :biggrin
 
Joined
Jun 21, 2007
Messages
10,028
Gender
Female
Christian
Yes
#20
I come up with 36 too... looking at this as a logic puzzle rather than a math puzzle.

(11 x 11)= 4 can be written as (1 + 1) x (1 +1) = 4 same as 2 x 2 = 4

Following the same pattern,
22 x 22 = 16 same as 4 x 4 = 16

33 x 33 = 36 same as 6 x 6 = 36.

Can extrapolate this out to:

44 x 44 = 64
55 x 55 = 100
66 x 66 = 144
 
Status
Not open for further replies.